LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB656
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB656
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB656
Compare Versions
AB656 Chaptered September 3, 2015
AB656 Enrolled August 21, 2015
AB656 Amended June 22, 2015
AB656 Amended May 4, 2015
AB656 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB656 Chaptered September 3, 2015
AB656 Enrolled August 21, 2015
AB656 Amended June 22, 2015
AB656 Amended May 4, 2015
AB656 Introduced February 24, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare