Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/17/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|