California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB66 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2014

Amended

Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 9, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015