Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2567.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|