California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB665 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015