California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 10, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill May 18, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015