LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB679
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB679
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB679
Compare Versions
AB679 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB679 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB679 Amended September 10, 2015
AB679 Amended August 18, 2015
AB679 Amended June 25, 2015
AB679 Amended May 18, 2015
AB679 Amended April 20, 2015
AB679 Amended March 26, 2015
AB679 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB679 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB679 Enrolled September 16, 2015
AB679 Amended September 10, 2015
AB679 Amended August 18, 2015
AB679 Amended June 25, 2015
AB679 Amended May 18, 2015
AB679 Amended April 20, 2015
AB679 Amended March 26, 2015
AB679 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare