California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB68 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015