LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB68
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB68
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB68
Compare Versions
AB68 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB68 Amended August 18, 2015
AB68 Amended June 1, 2015
AB68 Amended April 30, 2015
AB68 Amended March 26, 2015
AB68 Introduced December 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB68 Enrolled September 8, 2015
AB68 Amended August 18, 2015
AB68 Amended June 1, 2015
AB68 Amended April 30, 2015
AB68 Amended March 26, 2015
AB68 Introduced December 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare