California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB682 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill June 25, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015