LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB682
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB682
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB682
Compare Versions
AB682 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB682 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB682 Amended June 25, 2015
AB682 Amended May 13, 2015
AB682 Amended March 26, 2015
AB682 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB682 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB682 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB682 Amended June 25, 2015
AB682 Amended May 13, 2015
AB682 Amended March 26, 2015
AB682 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare