California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB704 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 15, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015