LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB704
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB704
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB704
Compare Versions
AB704 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB704 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB704 Amended July 6, 2015
AB704 Amended June 15, 2015
AB704 Amended April 6, 2015
AB704 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB704 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB704 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB704 Amended July 6, 2015
AB704 Amended June 15, 2015
AB704 Amended April 6, 2015
AB704 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare