Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hernandez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1107.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/18/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|