California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB72 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 25, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill September 9, 2015
Bill September 4, 2015