Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3475.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/18/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|