California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB73 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill January 5, 2016
Bill May 4, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015