|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 553, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6464.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5369.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1716.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|