California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB736 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016