|
01/15/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2995.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2587.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1697.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|