California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB74 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015