California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB752 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2015

Amended

Bill April 23, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015