LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB752
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB752
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB752
Compare Versions
AB752 Chaptered October 7, 2015
AB752 Enrolled August 31, 2015
AB752 Amended April 23, 2015
AB752 Amended March 26, 2015
AB752 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB752 Chaptered October 7, 2015
AB752 Enrolled August 31, 2015
AB752 Amended April 23, 2015
AB752 Amended March 26, 2015
AB752 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare