California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB764 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill June 9, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015