LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB764
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB764
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB764
Compare Versions
AB764 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB764 Amended September 1, 2015
AB764 Amended June 29, 2015
AB764 Amended June 23, 2015
AB764 Amended June 9, 2015
AB764 Amended April 16, 2015
AB764 Amended April 8, 2015
AB764 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB764 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB764 Amended September 1, 2015
AB764 Amended June 29, 2015
AB764 Amended June 23, 2015
AB764 Amended June 9, 2015
AB764 Amended April 16, 2015
AB764 Amended April 8, 2015
AB764 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare