California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB773 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015