California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB773 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/28/2015

 BILL NUMBER: AB 773CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 336 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 28, 2015 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2015 PASSED THE SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 1, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 1, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 21, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Baker FEBRUARY 25, 2015 An act to amend Section 2982 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business and professions. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 773, Baker. Board of Psychology: licenses. The Psychology Licensing Law establishes the Board of Psychology to license and regulate the practice of psychology. Under that law, psychology licenses expire on the legal birth date of the licensee during the 2nd year of a 2-year term. This bill would instead have those licenses expire at the end, as provided, of a 2-year period from the date the license was issued. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2982 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 2982. (a) All licenses expire and become invalid at 12 midnight on the last day of February, 1980, and thereafter shall expire at 12 midnight of the last date of the two-year period from the date the license was issued. (b) To renew an unexpired license, the licensee, on or before the date on which it would otherwise expire, shall apply for renewal on a form provided by the board, accompanied by the prescribed renewal fee.