|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6451.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5342.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3476.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3366.) (pending re-refer to Com. on HEALTH.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1320.) In committee: Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 845.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|