California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB796 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016