|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 590, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3194.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3205.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2749.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 10). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2645.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2646.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1808.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|