California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB802 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill September 10, 2015
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 1, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015