BILL NUMBER: AB 802AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 22, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 28, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 1, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 20, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 7, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Williams FEBRUARY 26, 2015 An act to amend Section 381.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy efficiency. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 802, as amended, Williams. Public utilities: energy efficiency savings. Existing law requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission (Energy Commission) to develop and implement a comprehensive program to achieve greater energy savings in existing residential and nonresidential building stock. Existing law requires the Public Utilities Commission (PUC) to investigate the ability of electrical corporations and gas corporations to provide various energy efficiency financing options to their customers for the purposes of implementing the program developed by the Energy Commission. This bill would require the PUC, by July 1, 2016, to authorize electrical corporations and gas corporations to recover in rates the reasonable costs of programs providingincentives or rebates or both incentives and rebatesincentives, rebates, technical assistance, and support to their customers to increase the energy efficiency of existing buildings, as specified. The bill would require the PUC to authorize electrical corporations and gas corporations to count all energy savings achieved toward overall energy efficiency goals or targets established by the PUC. The bill would authorize the PUC to adjust the energy efficiency goals or targets of electrical corporations and gas corporations to reflect the energy savings achieved in meeting or exceeding energy efficiency requirements in existing buildings. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 381.2 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 381.2. (a) The commission shall investigate the ability of electrical corporations and gas corporations to provide various energy efficiency financing options to their customers for the purposes of implementing the program developed pursuant to Section 25943 of the Public Resources Code. (b) (1) By July 1, 2016, the commission, in a separate or existing proceeding, shall authorize electrical corporations or gas corporations to recover in rates the reasonable costs of programs that provide financialincentives or rebates or both incentives and rebatesincentives, rebates, technical assistance, and support to their customers to increase the energy efficiency of existing buildings based on all estimated energy savings and energy usage reductions, taking into consideration the overall reduction in normalized metered energy consumption as a measure of energy savings. Those programs shall include energy usage reductions resulting from theinstallationadoption of a measure or installation of equipment required for modifications to existing buildings to bring them into conformity with, or exceed, the requirements of Title 24 of the California Code ofRegulations.Regulations, as well as operational, behavioral, and retrocommissioning activities. The commission shall authorize an electrical corporation and gas corporation to count all energy savings achieved toward overall energy efficiency goals or targets established by the commission. The commission may adjust the energy efficiency goals or targets of an electrical corporation and gas corporation to reflect the energy efficiency savings achieved in meeting or exceeding the requirements of Title 24 of the California Code of Regulations in existing buildings. (2) The commission shall prioritize energy efficiency activities consistent with Sections 454.55 and 454.56. (c) In the report prepared pursuant to Section 384.2, the commission shall include an assessment of each electrical corporation' s and each gas corporation's implementation of the program developed pursuant to Section 25943 of the Public Resources Code. (d) This section does not require the commission to increase funding for energy efficiency programs of electric corporations or gas corporations that are recoverable in rates.