California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB806 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill July 13, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015