LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB806
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB806
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB806
Compare Versions
AB806 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB806 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB806 Amended August 8, 2016
AB806 Amended August 1, 2016
AB806 Amended June 21, 2016
AB806 Amended June 6, 2016
AB806 Amended April 14, 2016
AB806 Amended July 13, 2015
AB806 Amended May 28, 2015
AB806 Amended April 6, 2015
AB806 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB806 Chaptered September 23, 2016
AB806 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB806 Amended August 8, 2016
AB806 Amended August 1, 2016
AB806 Amended June 21, 2016
AB806 Amended June 6, 2016
AB806 Amended April 14, 2016
AB806 Amended July 13, 2015
AB806 Amended May 28, 2015
AB806 Amended April 6, 2015
AB806 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare