|
08/12/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2416.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1906.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 1551.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|