California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB816 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 12, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 22, 2015
Bill May 14, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015