|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 811, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 5030.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 3524.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (January 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|