LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB821
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB821
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB821
Compare Versions
AB821 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB821 Enrolled August 19, 2016
AB821 Amended January 13, 2016
AB821 Amended January 4, 2016
AB821 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB821 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB821 Enrolled August 19, 2016
AB821 Amended January 13, 2016
AB821 Amended January 4, 2016
AB821 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare