|
01/19/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3144.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2705.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1884.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|