California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB825 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 14, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015