Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
In committee: Failed passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1339.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|