California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB83 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2015

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill July 15, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015