|
04/11/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 6, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3974.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3204.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1562.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|