LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB847
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB847
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB847
Compare Versions
AB847 Chaptered April 11, 2016
AB847 Enrolled March 17, 2016
AB847 Amended February 22, 2016
AB847 Amended February 10, 2016
AB847 Amended April 30, 2015
AB847 Amended March 26, 2015
AB847 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB847 Chaptered April 11, 2016
AB847 Enrolled March 17, 2016
AB847 Amended February 22, 2016
AB847 Amended February 10, 2016
AB847 Amended April 30, 2015
AB847 Amended March 26, 2015
AB847 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare