|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 781, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 854.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2611.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1756.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|