LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB854
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB854
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB854
Compare Versions
AB854 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB854 Enrolled September 15, 2015
AB854 Amended August 31, 2015
AB854 Amended August 18, 2015
AB854 Amended July 9, 2015
AB854 Amended May 28, 2015
AB854 Amended May 4, 2015
AB854 Amended April 14, 2015
AB854 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB854 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB854 Enrolled September 15, 2015
AB854 Amended August 31, 2015
AB854 Amended August 18, 2015
AB854 Amended July 9, 2015
AB854 Amended May 28, 2015
AB854 Amended May 4, 2015
AB854 Amended April 14, 2015
AB854 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare