California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB857 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 13, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 22, 2016

Amended

Bill May 11, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015