LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB857
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB857
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB857
Compare Versions
AB857 Chaptered July 22, 2016
AB857 Enrolled July 13, 2016
AB857 Amended May 11, 2016
AB857 Amended May 4, 2016
AB857 Amended August 18, 2015
AB857 Amended June 23, 2015
AB857 Amended June 16, 2015
AB857 Amended May 5, 2015
AB857 Amended April 15, 2015
AB857 Amended March 26, 2015
AB857 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB857 Chaptered July 22, 2016
AB857 Enrolled July 13, 2016
AB857 Amended May 11, 2016
AB857 Amended May 4, 2016
AB857 Amended August 18, 2015
AB857 Amended June 23, 2015
AB857 Amended June 16, 2015
AB857 Amended May 5, 2015
AB857 Amended April 15, 2015
AB857 Amended March 26, 2015
AB857 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare