California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB862 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill June 25, 2015
Bill June 8, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015