LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB862
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB862
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB862
Compare Versions
AB862 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB862 Enrolled August 26, 2015
AB862 Amended June 25, 2015
AB862 Amended June 8, 2015
AB862 Amended April 21, 2015
AB862 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB862 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB862 Enrolled August 26, 2015
AB862 Amended June 25, 2015
AB862 Amended June 8, 2015
AB862 Amended April 21, 2015
AB862 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare